+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- Accompanied a new draft, see H4681
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Monday April 4, 2022, pending concurrence
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2021 from 10:30 AM-02:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Labor and Workforce Development
+ − Sponsors (52)
Type:
Primary Sponsor