+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On August 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a study order, see S2888
On July 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On July 30, 2020 in the House:
- House adopted, in concurrence
- Amendment adopted
On June 1, 2020 in the House:
- House concurred
On May 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 15, 2020, pending concurrence
On April 27, 2020 in the House:
- House concurred
On April 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Friday May 15, 2020, pending concurrence
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- House concurred
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 15, 2020, pending concurrence
On July 8, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2019 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor