+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On November 12, 2013 in the Senate:
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 03/27/2013 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor