+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On July 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On June 22, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
On May 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
- Accompanied by H1732
On August 28, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/04/2019 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-2
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor