+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
- Accompanied by H184
On May 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 1, 2022, pending concurrence
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
On October 18, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor