+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On June 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a new draft, see S2760
On April 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 2, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday May 8, 2020, pending concurrence
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Monday March 23, 2020, pending concurrence
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Monday March 2, 2020, pending concurrence
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/04/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Discharged to the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor