+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
On November 30, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 12/08/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- House concurred
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Public Health
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor