+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On July 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 51 of the Acts of 2017
On July 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On July 19, 2017 in the House:
- Enacted
On July 17, 2017 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2017 from 11:00 AM-12:00 PM in A2
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor