+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On June 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a study order, see S2356
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
On November 9, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 11/17/2015 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- House concurred
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Public Health
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor