+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On July 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a study order, see S2266
On July 11, 2014 in the House:
- Amendment (changing reporting date to Friday July 18, 2014) adopted, pending concurrence
On July 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On July 9, 2014 in the House:
- House concurred
On June 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday July 03, 2014, pending concurrence
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- House concurred
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday May 15, 2014, pending concurrence
On September 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/13/2013 from 10:00 AM-08:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor