+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a study order, see S2535
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Tuesday March 20, 2018, pending concurrence
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/05/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor