+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On October 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 288 of the Acts of 2016
On September 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On September 29, 2016 in the House:
- Enacted
On September 26, 2016 in the House:
- Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
On September 15, 2016 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On August 29, 2016 in the House:
- Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On August 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
On December 3, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- House concurred
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor