+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a study order, see S2488
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 02/06/2018 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 04/03/2017 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A1 & A2
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Marijuana Policy