+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On December 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a new draft, see S2429
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Discharged to the committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Labor and Workforce Development
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor