+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On June 9, 2014 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H4153
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Tuesday June 03, 2014, pending concurrence
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2013 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure