+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On December 5, 2022 in the House:
- Amendment (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted
- Amendment (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted
- Read third
- Read second
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- New draft substituted, see H4339
- Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means)
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending
- Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending
- Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill, see H4339
On December 27, 2021 in the House:
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/09/2021 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor