+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On October 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2021
On October 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On October 14, 2021 in the House:
- Enacted
On October 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On October 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On July 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On July 14, 2021 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On June 1, 2021 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On May 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/19/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Service
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor