+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On September 1, 2022 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H5204
On May 12, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Sunday July 31, 2022, pending concurrence
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Monday May 9, 2022, pending concurrence
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Tuesday March 1, 2022, pending concurrence
On September 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/22/2021 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Housing