+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On July 28, 2021 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On July 21, 2021 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/20/2021 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Education
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor