+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On November 14, 2022 in the House:
- Accompanied a new draft, see H5385
On October 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2022 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
On October 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On October 11, 2022 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Public Service
On September 29, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor