+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On December 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On December 18, 2020 in the House:
- Enacted
On December 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
On December 10, 2020 in the House:
- Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
On October 15, 2020 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On September 17, 2020 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On August 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 08/31/2020 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Electronic Hearing
On August 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On August 17, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Service
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor