+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On December 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On December 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
On December 8, 2022 in the House:
- Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
On September 8, 2022 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On August 22, 2022 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On August 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 08/05/2022 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
On July 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On July 21, 2022 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
On July 11, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor