+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 1, 2020 in the House:
- Accompanied a new draft, see H4762
On May 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2020 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On May 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 30, 2020 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Election Laws
On April 27, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor