+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On December 1, 2022 in the House:
- Recommitted to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure
- Rules suspended
- Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10)
On May 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/31/2022 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
- Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD
On May 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/31/2022 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 26, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor