+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On May 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2020 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in The hearing will occur over Zoom
On May 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 13, 2020 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Elder Affairs
On April 2, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor