+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 4, 2020 in the House:
- Amended by substitution of a bill with a title change, H4691
- Read third (title changed)
On April 23, 2020 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
On April 21, 2020 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On April 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 27, 2020 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Public Service
On March 26, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor