+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 52 of the Acts of 2020
On March 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On March 19, 2020 in the House:
- Enacted
On March 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On March 19, 2020 in the House:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Public Service
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor