+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 3, 2017 in the House:
- No further action taken
On July 13, 2016 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On June 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/29/2016 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2
On June 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On June 22, 2016 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Public Service
On June 20, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor