+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On September 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 264 of the Acts of 2016
On September 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On September 6, 2016 in the House:
- Enacted
On September 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On August 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On August 15, 2016 in the House:
- Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed
On June 30, 2016 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On June 29, 2016 in the House:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
On June 23, 2016 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/15/2016 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Service
+ − Amendment
Amendment #1
Floor Amendment