+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On November 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 273 of the Acts of 2022
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 273 of the Acts of 2022
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On November 17, 2022 in the House:
- Enacted
On November 14, 2022 in the House:
- House concurred in the Senate amendment
On November 2, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Bills in the Third Reading
On October 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on Rules), ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session with an amendment
- Also based on S3061
On June 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
On June 6, 2022 in the House:
- Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
On May 2, 2022 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 03/09/2022 from 12:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
- Reporting date extended to Friday April 29, 2022, pending concurrence
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Transportation
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor