+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 3, 2017 in the House:
- No further action taken
On June 30, 2016 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On June 29, 2016 in the House:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
On June 9, 2016 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 16, 2016 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Public Service
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor