+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On June 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 98 of the Acts of 2020
On June 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On June 18, 2020 in the House:
- Enacted
On June 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On April 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
On April 9, 2020 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 01/29/2020 from 03:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
On December 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On December 5, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Service
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor