+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On June 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On June 2, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2022, pending concurrence
On May 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 2, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday June 2, 2022, pending concurrence
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 03/04/2022 from 04:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
- Senate concurred
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Monday May 2, 2022, pending concurrence
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Discharged to the committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy
On January 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On December 2, 2021 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
On November 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules