+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On October 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 242 of the Acts of 2022
On October 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On October 13, 2022 in the House:
- Enacted
On October 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On June 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On June 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On June 9, 2022 in the House:
- Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
On May 25, 2022 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On May 17, 2022 in the House:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
On March 21, 2022 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On December 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 01/04/2022 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On December 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On December 2, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Service
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor