+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On April 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 63 of the Acts of 2020
On April 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On April 9, 2020 in the House:
- Enacted
On April 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On December 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 01/02/2020 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1
On November 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On November 14, 2019 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Transportation
On October 31, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules