+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On October 6, 2022 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H5279
On June 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 23, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Sunday July 31, 2022, pending concurrence
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- Recommitted to the committee on Revenue
- Rules suspended
- Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10)
On December 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 12/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Revenue
+ − Sponsors (65)
Type:
Primary Sponsor