+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On October 29, 2019 in the House:
- Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4156
- Read third (title change)
On October 24, 2019 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On October 21, 2019 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On October 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On October 2, 2019 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Public Service
On September 25, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor