+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Accompanied a new draft, see H4364
On November 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 11/19/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Gardner Auditorium
On October 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On September 30, 2019 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight
On September 25, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules