+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On December 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
On December 19, 2019 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On December 2, 2019 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On November 26, 2019 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On November 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On November 12, 2019 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Public Service
On September 5, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor