+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On August 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 202 of the Acts of 2022
On August 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On August 22, 2022 in the House:
- Enacted
On August 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On June 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On May 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On May 23, 2022 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On January 10, 2022 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On January 5, 2022 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On September 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/28/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On September 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On August 30, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Service
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor