+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Accompanied a new draft, see H4596
On November 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 12/07/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On September 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On September 2, 2021 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture
On August 5, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor