+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 214 of the Acts of 2020
On November 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On November 23, 2020 in the House:
- Enacted
On November 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On October 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
On October 15, 2020 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On October 24, 2019 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On October 23, 2019 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On September 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
On July 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On July 24, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor