+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On July 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
On July 18, 2019 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On July 16, 2019 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On July 15, 2019 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On July 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On July 3, 2019 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Public Service
On July 2, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor