+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 26 of the Acts of 2022
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Enacted
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Notice Section
On August 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
On August 5, 2021 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On July 28, 2021 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On July 26, 2021 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On June 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On June 24, 2021 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Public Service
On June 21, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor