+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On July 5, 2022 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H4960
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing rescheduled to 06/09/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
- Hearing rescheduled to 06/09/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
- Hearing rescheduled to 06/09/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/09/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Service