+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On November 19, 2020 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H5126
On October 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Transportation
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor