+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On December 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 103 of the Acts of 2021
On December 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On December 13, 2021 in the House:
- Enacted
On December 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On October 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On September 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On September 16, 2021 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On September 13, 2021 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On September 7, 2021 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On June 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/23/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Election Laws
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor