+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On September 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 225 of the Acts of 2022
On September 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On September 22, 2022 in the House:
- Enacted
On September 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On June 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On June 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On May 31, 2022 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On October 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On July 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On July 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Revenue