+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On May 20, 2020 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H4722
On October 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
On October 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Public Service
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor