+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On June 16, 2021 in the House:
- Accompanied a new draft, see H3895
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/07/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure